This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2016 at 11:06:16 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK VS. HERNANDEZ, MAXIMO

Case Summary

On 02/27/2009 WELLS FARGO BANK filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HERNANDEZ, MAXIMO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Huntington Park Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0309

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Huntington Park Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A. AS TRUSTEE

Defendants

HERNANDEZ BARBARA

HERNANDEZ MAXIMO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TFLG, A LAW CORPORATION - DAVID R. ENDRES APC

Attorney at TFLG, A LAW CORPORATION

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2010
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2010
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 09/02/10 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 125.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2009
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2009
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 03/30/09 , FOR (WELLS FARGO BANK),N.A.,AS TRUSTEE , AGAINST (HERNANDEZ, MAXIMO) , (HERNANDEZ, BARBARA) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 3400 FLOWER STREET, HUNTINGTON PK, CA 90255 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2009
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 30.00 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. *FWD TO SHERIFF DEPT* . RECEIPT # HPK478659017 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2009
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (HERNANDEZ, MAXIMO) , (HERNANDEZ, BARBARA) , AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP, DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP , MEMO OF COSTS, IN THE SUM OF $ 0.00 , AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO (HERNANDEZ, MAXIMO) , (HERNANDEZ, BARBARA) AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2009
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN HPK478659016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2009
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 04/13/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 .

    Read MoreRead Less