This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2016 at 10:25:31 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK VS. CASTRO, JESUS

Case Summary

On 02/04/2009 WELLS FARGO BANK filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CASTRO, JESUS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Huntington Park Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0192

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Huntington Park Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE

Defendant

CASTRO JESUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACKSON & ASSOCIATES, INC - DOUG V. PHAM

Attorney at JACKSON & ASSOCIATES, INC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2010
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2010
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 09/02/10 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 125.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. *FWD TO SHERIFF DEPT* . RECEIPT # HPK538978015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 , HON. MICHAEL J. PEARCE PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING BY ATTORNEY LUKE DANIELS . DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING JESUS CASTRO .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2009
  • PAUL GILBERT SWORN AS WITNESS{ES} FOR PLAINTIFF .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2009
  • OMAR CASTRO (DEFENDANTS SON) SWORN AS INTERPRETER FOR DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2009
  • JESUS CASTRO SWORN AS WITNESS{ES} FOR DEFENDANT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2009
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2009
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 04/09/09 , FOR (WELLS FARGO BANK), NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE , AGAINST (CASTRO, JESUS) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 9214 SAN MIGUEL AVE, SOUTH GATE, CA 90280 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46. THE COURT ORDERS NO LOCKOUT PRIOR TO 4/30/09.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2009
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO (CASTRO, JESUS) AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2009
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (CASTRO, JESUS) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2009
  • APPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (CASTRO, JESUS) IS GRANTED. APPLICANT(S) MAY PROCEED IN THIS ACTION WITHOUT PAYMENT OF ANY COURT FEES OR COSTS LISTED IN RULE 985(I), CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2009
  • ANSWER FILED OF (CASTRO, JESUS) . RECEIPT # GC68511.03 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2009
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN HPK538978025.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2009
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 03/23/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 .

    Read MoreRead Less