This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/25/2016 at 09:44:18 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. VS. BERNDT, NEAL ALAN

Case Summary

On 06/19/2008 WELLS FARGO BANK, N A filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BERNDT, NEAL ALAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Clarita Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0756

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Clarita Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK N.A.

Defendant

BERNDT NEAL ALAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NAIMAN LAW GROUP, PROFESSIONAL CORP. - RANDALL D. NAIMAN ESQ

Attorney at NAIMAN LAW GROUP, PROFESSIONAL CORP.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2009
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2009
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 08/28/09 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2008
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 103.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2008
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2008
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 07/17/08 , FOR (WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.) , AGAINST (BERNDT, NEAL ALAN) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 22831 BANYAN PLACE UNIT 351, SANTA CLARITA, CA 91390 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2008
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED AND MAILED TO PLAINTIFF .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2008
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 25.00 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2008
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # NEW240853068 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT UNLAWFUL DETAINER, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO (BERNDT, NEAL ALAN) , ALL OCCUPANTS IN POSSESSION . COSTS OF $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2008
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (BERNDT, NEAL ALAN) , ALL OCCUPANTS . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED. REQUEST FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2008
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER RETURNED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS DUE TO FORWARD TIME EXP RTN TO SEND BERNDT NEAL PO BOX 802396 SANTA CLARITA CA 91380-2395 RETURN TO SENDER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2008
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER RETURNED AS TO (BERNDT, NEAL ALAN) DUE TO FORWARD TIME EXP RTN TO SEND BERNDT NEAL PO BOX 802396 SANTA CLARITA CA 91380-2395 RETURN TO SENDER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2008
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2008
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN NEW253967035.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2008
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2008
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.