Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/08/2016 at 19:48:38 (UTC).

WELLINGTON RESIDENTIAL COMMUNI VS. KIM, MAX

Case Summary

On 02/22/2006 WELLINGTON RESIDENTIAL COMMUNI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KIM, MAX. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1894

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WELLINGTON RESIDENTIAL COMMUNITY

PAE YANG SEO

Defendant

KIM MAX

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2007
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2006
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT{S} AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION{S}.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2006
  • DECLARATION RE: DAMAGES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2006
  • SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. SERVED AS NAMED AS TO HANG SHIK LEE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2006
  • SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. SERVED AS NAMED AS TO YANG SEO PAE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2006
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE/POSTPONEMENT FILED BY (KIM, MAX) . MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 05/04/06 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 090 . RECEIPT # 279625038 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2006
  • CIVIL SUBPENA ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2006
  • SUBPOENA AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. SERVED AS NAMED AS TO HONG SHIK LEE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2006
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SERVED AS TO (KIM, MAX) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/04/06 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 090 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2006
  • NOTICE OF CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2006
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (KIM, MAX) . RECEIPT # LAC460110001 . #7004 2510 0003 2909 8185

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2006
  • AMENDMENT TO CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF TO CORRECT HIS NAME FILED ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2006
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # LAC244532019 . HEARING SET FOR 04/04/06 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 090

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE WELLINGTON RESIDENTIAL COMMUNITY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant