This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2016 at 05:26:09 (UTC).

WANG, MENG VS. NOCK, ANNA

Case Summary

On 02/05/2009 WANG, MENG filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NOCK, ANNA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, El Monte Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LYNN D. OLSON and JACK MARSH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0326

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    El Monte Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LYNN D. OLSON

JACK MARSH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WANG MENG

Defendant

NOCK ANNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEN & CHAN APLC - ALFRED CHAN

Attorney at SHEN & CHAN APLC

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF KIM L. BENSEN - DEENA C. FRAH ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF KIM L. BENSEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2010
  • RECEIVED FEES FROM ALFRED H. CHAN ESQ. IN THE SUM OF $ 1.50 FOR REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL VIA FAX . RECEIPT # ELM443036014 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2010
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2010
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR JURY TRIAL TO 08/23/10 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 . RECEIPT # . . ANY JURY FEES ON FILE TO STAND.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2010
  • MATTER SET FOR STATUS CONFERENCE ON 08/20/10 AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2010
  • MEDIATION STATEMENT OF NON-AGREEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2010
  • NEXT ACTION DUE 03/01/10 AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. 001 . POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2009
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE MEDIATION CUTOFF DATE POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2009
  • ORDER RE: MEDIATION CUT-OFF DATE CONTINUED TO 1/29/10. POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 03/01/10 AT 9:00AM IN DIV.001 SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2009
  • FUNDS IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 15.00 REFUNDED TO LAW OFFICES OF KIM L. BENSEN , RE: OVERPAYMENT OF ANSWER FILED BY ANNA NOCK . CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2009
  • NOTICE TO BOOKKEEPER ISSUED TO LAW OFFICES OF KIM L. BENSEN IN THE AMOUNT OF $15.00 (OVERPAYMENT OF ANSWER FILED BY ANNA NOCK) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2009
  • ANSWER FILED OF (NOCK, ANNA) . RECEIPT # ELM333333031 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2009
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY (NOCK, ANNA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS,COMPLAINT,ADR PACKAGE,CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM,NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW FILED. SERVED AS TO (NOCK, ANNA) . COSTS OF $ 70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2009
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN ELM236112018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 001 OF HONORABLE LYNN D. OLSON .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2009
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 06/25/09 AT 09:30A M, IN DEPT. 001 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 02/06/09

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.