This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2018 at 08:32:02 (UTC).

WANG, KEVIN VS DEL ROSARIO, EDUARDO RAZO

Case Summary

On 10/15/2009 WANG, KEVIN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DEL ROSARIO, EDUARDO RAZO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIZABETH MUNISOGLU. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2086

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIZABETH MUNISOGLU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WANG KEVIN

Defendant

DEL ROSARIO EDUARDO RAZO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/28/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE INGLEWOOD COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM LAW09W02086 TO ING09SX2086

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. ELIZABETH MUNISOGLU PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2010
  • CASE RESTORED TO ACTIVE STATUS FOR THE FOLLOWING ADMINISTRATIVE REASON{S}: DISMISSAL WAS VACATED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. ELIZABETH MUNISOGLU PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2010
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 01/29/10 . FOR (WANG, KEVIN) . AGAINST (DEL ROSARIO, EDUARDO RAZO) . PRINCIPAL $ 7500.00 . COSTS $ 105.00 . TOTAL $ 7605.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2009
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING RETURNED AS TO (WANG, KEVIN) DUE TO NO EXPLANATION PROVIDED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED BY SHERIFF. SERVED AS TO (DEL ROSARIO, EDUARDO RAZO) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/29/10 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 . COSTS OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. ELIZABETH MUNISOGLU PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2009
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2009
  • MATTER RE-SCHEDULED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 01/29/10 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2009
  • RE: ORDER VACATING JUDGMENT. . ON COURT'S OWN MOTION JUDGMENT ORDERED ON 12/4/2009 IS NOW VACATED DUE TO INCOMPLETE PROOF OF SERVICE. PLAINTIFF IS TO APPEAR IN CLERK'S OFFICE BY 12/18/2009 TO RESET HEARING OR THE CASE WILL BE DISMISSED. . CLERK TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. ELIZABETH MUNISOGLU PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PROOF OF SERVICE INCOMPLETE. JUDGMENT ORDERED VACATED. PLAINTIFF TO RESET HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 12/18/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2009
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM DEPT. 92 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2009
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED AS TO (DEL ROSARIO, EDUARDO RAZO) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2009
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN 1091016E3365. HEARING SET FOR 12/04/09 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. 092.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2009
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FOR SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL ELECTRONICALLY REQUESTED FOR DEFENDANT(S) (DEL ROSARIO, EDUARDO RAZO)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.