Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/06/2016 at 17:12:29 (UTC).

WAGNER, DAVID VS. MYER-TRAN, CANDICE R.

Case Summary

On 10/28/2011 WAGNER, DAVID filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MYER-TRAN, CANDICE R. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID JOHANSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1892

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID JOHANSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WAGNER DAVID

Defendant

MYER-TRAN CANDICE R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST JOHN, LLP - TRINKAUS, KIMBERLY K.

Attorney at KIMBALL, TIREY & ST JOHN, LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE PASADENA COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM CIT11U01892 TO PAS11UJ1892

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. ATTY. SERV. . RECEIPT # CIT472215005 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 , HON. DAVID JOHANSON PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL AND DEFAULT PROVE-UP. PLAINTIFF APPEARING A. GARY ARAKELIAN . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • MARIA RUIZ SWORN AS WITNESS{ES} FOR PLAINTIFF .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBITS MARKED FOR IDENTIFICATION: #1-NOTICE OF TRIAL (BY REFERENCE) #2-LEASE AGREEMENT (BY REFERENCE) #3-3 DAY NOTICE (BY REFERENCE) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • DEFENDANT'S ANSWER IS STRICKEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2011
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2011
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2011
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL ON 11/23/11 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2011
  • ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED AS TO (MYER-TRAN, CANDICE R.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2011
  • ANSWER FILED OF (MYER-TRAN, CANDICE R.) . RECEIPT # WAIVER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2011
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (MYER-TRAN, CANDICE R.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2011
  • REQUEST AND ORDER TO WAIVE COURT FEES AS TO (MYER-TRAN, CANDICE R.) FILED AND FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT 002 FOR CONSIDERATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2011
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN PAID.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less