This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/21/2016 at 15:27:04 (UTC).

VPET USA INC. VS. A & A SMART SHOPPING

Case Summary

On 01/22/2009 VPET USA INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against A A SMART SHOPPING. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, El Monte Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LYNN D. OLSON and LIA R. MARTIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0147

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    El Monte Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LYNN D. OLSON

LIA R. MARTIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VPET USA INC.

Defendant

A & A SMART SHOPPING A BUSINESS ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRONG LUAT CAO - LUAT T. CAO

Attorney at TRONG LUAT CAO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. 001 , HON. COMM. LIA R. MARTIN PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2009
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2009
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 10/15/09 AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2009
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. 001 , HON. LYNN D. OLSON PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: MATTER IS SET FOR STATUS CONFERENCE ON 07/16/09 AT 9:00AM IN DIVISION 001.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2009
  • MATTER SET FOR STATUS CONFERENCE ON 07/16/09 AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. 001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (A & A SMART SHOPPING) A BUSINESS ENTITY . COSTS OF $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2009
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (A & A SMART SHOPPING) A BUSINESS ENTITY . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2009
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN ELM482668008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 001 OF HONORABLE LYNN D. OLSON .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2009
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 06/11/09 AT 09:30A M, IN DEPT. 001 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 01/22/09

    Read MoreRead Less