This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/26/2016 at 20:56:31 (UTC).

VELEZ, DAVID LOUIS VS. RODRIGUEZ, ROBERT

Case Summary

On 11/16/2006 VELEZ, DAVID LOUIS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ, ROBERT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Clarita Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LLOYD NASH, SITE and LLOYD NASH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1594

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LLOYD NASH, SITE

Judge

LLOYD NASH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VELEZ DAVID LOUIS

Defendants

WHEELER MICHAEL JACOB

RODRIGUEZ ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM S. LEONARD - WILLIAM S. LEONARD ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM S. LEONARD

Defendant Attorney

GILBERT, KELLY, CROWLEY & JENNETT - PAUL S. SAMAAN

Attorney at GILBERT, KELLY, CROWLEY & JENNETT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2009
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2009
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 05/20/09 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2007
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2007
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIVISION/DEPARTMENT 001 FOR CONSIDERATION OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AFTER CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2007
  • CAUSE CALLED IN DIV/DEPT. 001 , HON. LLOYD NASH, SITE JUDGE PRESIDING FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE/REVIEW: MATTER IS REFERRED TO MEDIATION. COMPLETION DATE IS 04/18/08 . POST MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 05/02/08 AT 10:30A M, IN DIV/DEPT. 004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2007
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED ADR CASE REFERRAL INTAKE; ADR DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION; NOTICE RE CASES REFERRED TO ADR .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2007
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO CHATSWORTH COURTHOUSE, 9425 PENFIELD AVENUE, CHATSWORTH, CA ATTN: MELISSA GORSE, ADR CLERK, VIA COURT MESSENGER RE: MEDIATION PROCESSING .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2007
  • NOTICE RE: OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2007
  • STIPULATION FOR MEDIATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2007
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIVISION/DEPARTMENT 001 FOR CONSIDERATION OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AFTER CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW .

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2007
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (VELEZ, DAVID LOUIS) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2007
  • ANSWER FILED OF (RODRIGUEZ, ROBERT) . RECEIPT # NEW240853001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2007
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY (RODRIGUEZ, ROBERT) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2006
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED INSERTING IN PLACE AND STEAD OF FICTITIOUS NAME DOE 1 THE TRUE NAME OF (WHEELER, MICHAEL JACOB) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2006
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (VELEZ, DAVID LOUIS) FOR REJECTION OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT - ATTORNEY SIGNATURE IS IN THE WRONG PLACED FOR A DOE. SUBMITTED ON 12/12/06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2006
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN NEW520871029.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2006
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2006
  • NOTICE RE: OF CASE ASSIGNMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2006
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 04/13/07 AT 08:00A M, IN DIV/DEPT. CLK . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 11/16/06

    Read MoreRead Less