This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2016 at 11:05:18 (UTC).

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS. VILLAGRAN, JORGE

Case Summary

On 02/23/2009 U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against VILLAGRAN, JORGE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse North located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANTY PETERS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0307

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse North

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANTY PETERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATIONAS TRUSTEE

Defendants

VILLAGRAN SILVIA

VILLAGRAN JORGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TFLG, A LAW CORPORATION - DAVID R. ENDRES

Attorney at TFLG, A LAW CORPORATION

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2009
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT 005 RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2009
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A PARTIAL DISPOSITION ON 04/20/09 , FOR (U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION)AS TRUSTEE , AGAINST (VILLAGRAN, JORGE) PAST DUE RENT $ 0.00 , DAILY DAMAGES $ 0.00 , ATTORNEY FEES $ 0.00 , COSTS $ 0.00 . TOTAL $ .00 , RESTITUTION OF PREMISES LOCATED AT 170 NORTH CATARACT AVENUE, SAN DIMAS, CA 91773 . IMMEDIATE POSSESSION TODAY (4/13/09). IF POSSESSION IS RECEIVED, CASE WILL BE DISMISSED AT THE NEXT COURT DATE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2009
  • STIPULATION FOR COMMISSIONER TO ACT AS TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 005 , HON. ANTHONY PETERS PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. . MATTER CONTINUED FOR COURT TRIAL TO 04/20/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 005 . IF NO APPEARANCES BY OR FOR THE PARTIES AT THE NEXT COURT DATE, THE COURT WILL ORDER CASE DIMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO CORR DESK RE: SUB OF ATTNY/CHANGE OF ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2009
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION)AS TRUSTEE FOR REJECTION OF NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS: YOU NEED TO DO A DECLARATION OF MAILING. PLEASE FILL OUT THE BACKSIDE AND RESUBMIT. YOUR DOCUMENT IS BEING RETURNED BY MAIL. SUBMITTED ON 04/03/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT. 005 RE: 04/13/09 CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2009
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL ON 04/13/09 AT 01:30P M., IN DEPT. 005 .

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2009
  • ANSWER FILED OF (VILLAGRAN, JORGE) , (VILLAGRAN, SILVIA) . RECEIPT # GC68511.3 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2009
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (VILLAGRAN, JORGE) , (VILLAGRAN, SILVIA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2009
  • ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS OF (VILLAGRAN, JORGE) , (VILLAGRAN, SILVIA) SIGNED AND FILED. APPLICANT(S) PERMITTED TO PROCEED WITHOUT PAYMENT OF THE FOLLOWING COURT FEES AND COSTS: AS LISTED IN CRC 985 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2009
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN POM505123004.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 005 OF HONORABLE ANTHONY PETERS .

    Read MoreRead Less