This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/21/2016 at 09:30:07 (UTC).

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS. REY- MONROY, MA. MILDRED

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against REY- MONROY, MA MILDRED. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1744

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR CSFB ARMT 2006-2

Defendant

REY- MONROY MA. MILDRED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PITE DUNCAN LLP - DANIEL R. GAMEZ

Attorney at PITE DUNCAN LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE LONG BEACH COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM COM08Q01744 TO LB 08Q01744

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 125.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2008
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. JH SH . RECEIPT # PAID .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2008
  • DEFAULT REC'VD CG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO (REY- MONROY, MA. MILDRED) AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2008
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (REY- MONROY, MA. MILDRED) , AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP, DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP , MEMO OF COSTS, IN THE SUM OF $ .00 , AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2008
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2008
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 11/06/08 , FOR (US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION) AS TRUSTEE FOR CSFB ARMT 2006-2 , AGAINST (REY- MONROY, MA. MILDRED) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 22811 SHELL DRIVE, CARSON, CA 90745 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2008
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2008
  • ORDER GRANTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY POSTING AND MAILING SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2008
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT 00N FOR CONSIDERATION .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2008
  • APPLICATION/DECLARATION AND ORDER ALLOWING SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING FOR (REY- MONROY, MA. MILDRED) RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO DEPT. 00N FOR CONSIDERATION. RECEIPT # PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2008
  • DECLARATION RE: DUE DILIGENCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2008
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN COM466510060.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.