This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2016 at 09:44:15 (UTC).

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS. LUNA, DUGLAS

Case Summary

On 01/16/2009 U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LUNA, DUGLAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, El Monte Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LYNN D. OLSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0046

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    El Monte Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LYNN D. OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE

Defendant

LUNA DUGLAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE ENDRES LAW FIRM - DAVID R. ENDRES

Attorney at THE ENDRES LAW FIRM

Defendant Attorney

TORRES LAW GROUP - ELIZABETH TORRES

Attorney at TORRES LAW GROUP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 125.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. NO LOCK OUT PRIOR TO 4-7-09 FORWARDED TO EL MONTE SHERIFF DEPARTMENT . RECEIPT # ELM333333001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2009
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 40.00 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2009
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 , HON. LYNN D. OLSON PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING BY: LUKE DANIELS ESQ. FOR DAVID R. ENDRES ESQ. . DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING BY: LUAT T. CAO ESQ. FOR ELIZABETH TORRES ESQ. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2009
  • JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION ORDERED ENTERED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2009
  • JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2009
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 03/05/09 , FOR (U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION) AS TRUSTEE , AGAINST (LUNA, DUGLAS) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 776 LANNY AVENUE, LA PUENTE, CA 91744 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46. ** NO LOCKOUT PRIOR TO 04/07/09 **

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2009
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR COURT TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2009
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT UNLAWFUL DETAINER,PREJUDGMENT CLAIM, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET & ADDENDUM,STMT OF LOCATION FILED. SERVED AS TO (LUNA, DUGLAS) . COSTS OF $ 77.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT UNLAWFUL DETAINER,PREJUDGMENT CLAIM, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET & ADDENDUM,STMT OF LOCATION FILED. SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS . COSTS OF $ 57.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2009
  • ANSWER FILED OF (LUNA, DUGLAS) . RECEIPT # ELM482668007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2009
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN ELM478900014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less