This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2016 at 06:57:48 (UTC).

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS. CATANO, MARIA T.

Case Summary

On 10/22/2009 U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against CATANO, MARIA T. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Huntington Park Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1449

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION

Defendant

CATANO MARIA T. INIDIVIDUALLY AND DOING BUSINESS AS SUPERIOR BROKERS RE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FOX JOHNS LAZAR PEKIN TREADGOLD & WEXLER - GEORGE C. LAZAR

Attorney at FOX JOHNS LAZAR PEKIN TREADGOLD & WEXLER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2011
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2011
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 01/11/11 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2010
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 125.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2009
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2009
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 12/22/09 . FOR (U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION), A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION . AGAINST (CATANO, MARIA T.), INIDIVIDUALLY AND DOING BUSINESS AS (SUPERIOR BROKERS REALTY) . FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 5510 PACIFIC BOULEVARD, HUNTINGTON PK, CA 90255 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2009
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 40.00 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. *PLACED IN PICKUP BOX(ADVANCED)* . RECEIPT # HPK538978008 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2009
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2009
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF HEARING RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE ANY AND ALL PAPERS/DOCUMENTS NECESSARY TO BRING THE MATTER TO TRIAL OR TO EFFECT A FINAL DISPOSITION AS TO ALL ISSUES AND PARTIES TO THE ACTION. ORDER SIGNED AND FILED BY JAIME R. CORRAL . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/07/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2009
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION), A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT:// SECTION SECTION 8 ON PAGE 2 IS INCOMPLETE. COMPLETE A NEW FORM CIV-100 REQUESTING A CLERK'S JUDGMENT AND COMPLETE ALL REQUIRED SECTIONS. ALSO, YOU ARE ADVISED THAT THE CORRECT SUBMITTED ON 11/24/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES / ROES 1-25 , [INCLUSIVE] ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2009
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (CATANO, MARIA T.), INIDIVIDUALLY AND DOING BUSINESS AS (SUPERIOR BROKERS REALTY) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (CATANO, MARIA T.), INIDIVIDUALLY AND DOING BUSINESS AS (SUPERIOR BROKERS REALTY) . COSTS OF $ 122.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2009
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER RETURNED AS TO (CATANO, MARIA T.), INIDIVIDUALLY AND DOING BUSINESS AS (SUPERIOR BROKERS REALTY) DUE TO UNABLE TO FORWARD .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2009
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN HPK538978029.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2009
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 12/07/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank National Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAZAR GEORGE CHESNAYE