This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/02/2016 at 07:08:36 (UTC).

U.S. BANK N.A. VS. ACUNA, MARVIN

Case Summary

On 02/16/2010 U S BANK N A filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ACUNA, MARVIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLIE E. BROWN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0126

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LESLIE E. BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK N.A. IN IT'S CAPACITY AS TRUSTEE FOR THE REGISTERED HOLDERS OF MA

Defendant

ACUNA MARVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF LES ZIEVE - MICHAEL GONZALES

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF LES ZIEVE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2012
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • DocketPURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 01/09/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2010
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2010
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 006 , HON. JUDGE LESLIE E. BROWN PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED. MATTER CONTINUED TO 08/26/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2010
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT 006 FOR CONSIDERATION COURT HEARINGS 07/15/10 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2010
  • DocketREJECT SHEET SENT TO (U.S. BANK N.A.) IN IT'S CAPACITY AS TRUSTEE FOR (THE REGISTERED HOLDERS OF MASTR ASSET BACKED SECURITIES TRUST 2005-NC2, MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2005-NC2) FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ENTERED ONLY AS TO ACUNA,MARVIN AND ANY AND ALL ONLY, (1) NEED PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO JAMES LEE THEN WE COULD FINISH YOUR PACKAGE..PLEASE A NEW REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO LEE,W/PROOF SUBMITTED ON 06/21/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2010
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO (JOHN DOE) AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2010
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT,UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED. SERVED AS TO (ACUNA, MARVIN) . COSTS OF $ 119.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2010
  • DocketREQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (ACUNA, MARVIN) , AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP, DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP , MEMO OF COSTS, IN THE SUM OF $ 0.00 , AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2010
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER SIGNED AND FILED BY LESLIE E. BROWN . MATTER SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE ANY AND ALL PAPERS/DOCUMENTS NECESSARY TO BRING THE MATTER TO TRIAL OR TO EFFECT A FINAL DISPOSITION AS TO ALL ISSUES AND PARTIES TO THE ACTION. HEARING ON 07/15/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 006 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2010
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2010
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN BH542559002.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 006 OF HONORABLE LESLIE E. BROWN .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where US BANK NA IN ITS CAPACITY AS TRUSTEE FOR THE HOLDERS OF MORGAN STANLEY DEAN WITTER CAPITAL I INC TRUST 2002 HE1 MORTGAGE PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2002 HE1 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GONZALES MICHAEL