This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/17/2019 at 01:51:54 (UTC).

UNLIMITED REPROGRAPHICS VS LOLITA CARRICO INC.

Case Summary

On 01/28/2009 UNLIMITED REPROGRAPHICS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LOLITA CARRICO INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0803

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNLIMITED REPROGRAPHICS

Defendants

MODERN MOM INC

LOLITA CARRICO INC.

CARRICO LOLITA

CARRICO LOLITA DBA MODERN MOM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

VALENZUELA, REGINO MAX

VALENZUELA REGINO MAX

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2009
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2009
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2009
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2009
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2009
  • SUBMISSION FOR CLERK'S CIVIL JUDGMENT PENDING*** DEFAULT PROCESSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2009
  • DISMISSAL AS TO DOES 1 TO 20 INCLUSIVE ONLY WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED. DISMISSAL AS TO DOES 1 TO 20 INCLUSIVE ONLY WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2009
  • AFFIDAVIT FILED. AFFIDAVIT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2009
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED. DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2009
  • ATTORNEY FEES PURSUANT TO CCP 1717.5 FILED. ATTORNEY FEES PURSUANT TO CCP 1717.5 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2009
  • DECLARATION OF COMPLIANCE WITH CCP SECTION 1033 FILED. DECLARATION OF COMPLIANCE WITH CCP SECTION 1033 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2009
  • A/C - COMPLAINT FILED REASON: TYPO CORRECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2009
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING *** DEFAULT PROCESSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2009
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2009
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND NOT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED+ PROOF OF SERVICE FILED+ SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT AS TO: MODERN MOM DATE SERV: 2-03-09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2009
  • OSC SET 08/03/09, 0830 AM, DEPT. 106, NOTICE FILED & MAILED * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2009
  • COMPLAINT FILED - COLLECTION CASE Filing Fee: 200.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.