This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/25/2016 at 10:42:23 (UTC).

UNILEV MANAGEMENT CORPORATION VS. BARMAS, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/08/2008 UNILEV MANAGEMENT CORPORATION filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against BARMAS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0942

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNILEV MANAGEMENT CORPORATION

Defendant

BARMAS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARK R. CONSTANT - MARK R. CONSTANT ESQ

Attorney at MARK R. CONSTANT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/20/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE SANTA MONICA COURTHOUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM BH 08U00942 TO SM 08UB0942

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2009
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 02/23/09 . FOR (UNILEV MANAGEMENT CORPORATION) . AGAINST (BARMAS, INC.) . PRINCIPAL $ 20026.70 . ATTORNEY FEES $ 1000.00 . INTEREST $ 0.00 . COSTS $ 375.00 . TOTAL $ 21,401.70 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT 006 FOR CONSIDERATION COURT JUDGMENT .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2009
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY COURT FOR DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO (BARMAS, INC.) ON 02/04/09 FILED. DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 375.00 , AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2009
  • DECLARATION RE: SEC. 585(D) CCP FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT,UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED. SERVED AS TO (BARMAS, INC.) . COSTS OF $ 35.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO MICHAEL A. BARUCH) (POSTING) AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2009
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (BARMAS, INC.) , AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP, DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP , MEMO OF COSTS, IN THE SUM OF $ 225.00 , AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2009
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FOR DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO (BARMAS, INC.) ANY AND ALL OCCUPANT PURSUANT T CC 415.46 ON 01/09/09 FILED. DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 225.00 , AND DECLARATON OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2009
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 01/09/09 , FOR (UNILEV MANAGEMENT CORPORATION) , AGAINST (BARMAS, INC.) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 9250 WILSHIRE BLVD.,SUITE 210, BEVERLY HILLS, CA 90210 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2008
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2008
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN BH538847024.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2008
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2008
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less