This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2016 at 12:00:14 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS VS. TRAN, TRANG M.

Case Summary

On 03/18/2009 UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TRAN, TRANG M. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, El Monte Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LYNN D. OLSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0821

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    El Monte Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LYNN D. OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS ASSIGNEE OF PALISADES COLLECTION LLC A PA

Defendant

TRAN TRANG M. AN INDIVIDUAL

Cross Plaintiff

TRAN TRANG M.

Cross Defendants

PALISADES COLLECTION LLC A NEW JERSEY LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS AN OHIO CORPORATION

LANG RICHERT & PATCH A PROFESSOINALCORPORATION A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

LANG, RICHERT & PATCH - MATTHEW W. QUALL ESQ

Attorney at LANG, RICHERT & PATCH

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

BENJUMEA & SOO-HOO, APC - BRIAN J. SOO-HOO

Attorney at BENJUMEA & SOO-HOO, APC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2009
  • *VOIDED DOCUMENT* PURSUANT TO SECTION C.C.P. 411.20, THE ANSWER TO COMPLAINT DOCUMENT FILED BY (TRAN, TRANG M.), AN INDIVIDUAL ON 05/11/09 , IS HEREBY VOID FOR FAILURE TO PAY FOR RETURNED NSF CHECK. PURSUANT TO SECTION 411.21 (B) OF CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2009
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED CLERK'S NOTICE OF VOIDING OF FILING .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2009
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS), ASSIGNEE OF (PALISADES COLLECTION, LLC), A PARTNERSHIP DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL- WE ARE UNABLE TO PROCESS THE REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL. THERE IS A CROSS COMPLAINT ON FILE. SUBMITTED ON 07/20/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2009
  • `NSF` CHECK RECEIVED FOR BRIAN J. SOO-HOO , (TRAN, TRANG M.), AN INDIVIDUAL NOTIFIED BY MAIL PER SECTION C.C.P. 411.20. PAYMENT DUE BY 07/10/09 , IN THE SUM OF $ 261.00 . RE: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 5/11/09 CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING FEES REQUIRED & CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2009
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (TRAN, TRANG M.), AN INDIVIDUAL FOR REJECTION OF CHECK IN THE AMOUNT OF $176.00; 1ST APPEARANCE FEE IS $200.00. PLEASE SUBMIT APPROPRIATE AMOUNT. YOUR CHECK (#708) IS HEREBY BEING RETURNED. SUBMITTED ON 05/21/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2009
  • ORDER DENYING APPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS OF (TRAN, TRANG M.), AN INDIVIDUAL SIGNED AND FILED. APPLICANT(S) HAVE TEN DAYS FROM THE DATE OF NOTICE OF DENIAL OF WAIVER TO POST THE PROPER FEES WITH THE CLERK'S OFFICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2009
  • ANSWER FILED OF (TRAN, TRANG M.), AN INDIVIDUAL . CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED. CROSS-COMPLAINANT (TRAN, TRANG M.) . CROSS-DEFENDANT (UNIFUND CCR PARTNERS), AN OHIO CORPORATION , (PALISADES COLLECTION), LLC, A NEW JERSEY LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY , (LANG, RICHERT & PATCH), A PROFESSOINAL CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION . RECEIPT # CRC 985

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2009
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (TRANG, TRAN M.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2009
  • APPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (TRAN, TRANG M.), AN INDIVIDUAL IS GRANTED. APPLICANT(S) MAY PROCEED IN THIS ACTION WITHOUT PAYMENT OF ANY COURT FEES OR COSTS LISTED IN RULE 3.61 CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2009
  • NOTICE OF WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2009
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (TRAN, TRANG M.), AN INDIVIDUAL FOR REJECTION OF FEE WAIVER-PER OUR CONVERSATION PLEASE SUBMIT FEE WAIVERS ALONG WITH THE RESPONSE. ALSO PLEASE CORRECT THE HIGHLIGHTED SECTION ON THE ORDER. THANK YOU. SUBMITTED ON 04/24/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT;DECLARATION REGARDING STATEMENT OF VENUE CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET/ADDENDUM;CASE ASSIGNMENT; ADR PACKAGE FILED. SERVED AS TO (TRAN, TRANG M.), AN INDIVIDUAL . COSTS OF $ 39.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2009
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN ELM333333003.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 001 OF HONORABLE LYNN D. OLSON .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2009
  • DECLARATION RE: VENUE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY LYNN D. OLSON TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 09/28/09 AT 09:00A M., IN DEPT. 001 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less