This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/09/2016 at 08:03:25 (UTC).

TWAROWSKI PACIFIC, LLC VS. CUCCO, RANDI

Case Summary

On 10/24/2007 TWAROWSKI PACIFIC, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CUCCO, RANDI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARTIN GREEN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1278

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARTIN GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TWAROWSKI PACIFIC LLC

Defendants

CUCCO JERRY

CUCCO RANDI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2014
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2014
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 04/03/14 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE VAN NUYS COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM CHA07W01278 TO LAV07W01278

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2007
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. F43 , HON. MARTIN GREEN PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2007
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2007
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN CHA504910006. HEARING SET FOR 11/28/07 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. F43.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TWAROWSKI PACIFIC LLC is a litigant