This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/26/2016 at 05:39:07 (UTC).

TURNER, ALICE VS BELL, ANDRA M

Case Summary

On 04/01/2008 TURNER, ALICE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BELL, ANDRA M. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4011

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TURNER ALICE

Defendant

BELL ANDRA M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2008
  • WRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2008
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED/RETURNED MAIL/JB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2008
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2008
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2008
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2008
  • JUDGMENT AS TO UNNAMED TENANTS - CCP 415.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2008
  • RECEIVED WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2008
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2008
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FOR UNNAMED TENANTS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2008
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2008
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2008
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.