This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2022 at 07:36:59 (UTC).

TRACT NO. 33119 ASSOCIATION VS. KENGYE, LAJOS

Case Summary

On 04/30/2010 TRACT NO 33119 ASSOCIATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KENGYE, LAJOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse North located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEANENE YRIARTE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1515

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEANENE YRIARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRACT NO. 33119 ASSOCIATIONAKA VIA VERDE TRACT 33119 COMMUNITY AS

Defendant

KENGYE LAJOS ET LA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT E. WEISS, INC. - CRIS A. KLINGERMAN ESQ

Attorney at ROBERT E. WEISS, INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2012
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • DocketPURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON07/26/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2012
  • DocketCASE FILE RECEIVED FROM THE POMONA NORTH COURTHOUSE ANDFILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2012
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO WEST COVINA COURT RE: RELOCATEDCASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2010
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2010
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION ASTO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2010
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALLPARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2010
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED IN DEPT. 005 HON. GEANENE YRIARTEPRESIDING FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE/REVIEW: CASEMANAGEMENT REVIEW IS TAKEN OFF CALENDAR AND SET FOR ANORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON 101810, AT 8:30 A.M.IN DEPARTMENT 5, FOR FAILING TO FILE A REQUEST FOR ENTRYOF DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT. IF THE REQUEST IS FILED ATLEAST 10 COURT DAYS PRIOR TO THE NEXT COURT HEARING DATETHEN NO APPERANCE SHALL BE REQUIRED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OFTHE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TOFILE A REQUET FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT .ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SIGNED AND FILED BY GEANENE YRIARTE. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 10/18/10 AT 08:30A M, INDEPT. 005 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2010
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2010
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2010
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT 5 RE: 9-17-10 CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2010
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2010
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES / ROES 1 TO10 , [INCLUSIVE] ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2010
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO P.O.S. DESK RE: P.O.S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2010
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; OSC/CASEMANAGEMENT REVIEW NOTICE, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT, ADRPACKAGE FILED. SERVED AS TO (KENGYE, LAJOS) ET LA .COSTS OF $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED. RN POM234074006.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • DocketNON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR09/17/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 005 . CLERK`SCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVEPARTIES/COUNSEL ON 04/30/10

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLINGERMAN CRIS A.