This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/08/2016 at 05:30:55 (UTC).

TIVOLI COVE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIA VS. HENG, SEAHQJIWUE

Case Summary

On 08/12/2008 TIVOLI COVE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HENG, SEAHQJIWUE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Malibu Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are J.H. FORD and H. JAY FORD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0185

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

J.H. FORD

Presiding Judge

H. JAY FORD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TIVOLI COVE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT MUTUAL BE

Defendant

HENG SEAHQJIWUE AN INDIVIDUAL AND DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAPKIN GITLIN & BEAUMONT - CHRISTINA C GASPAR

Attorney at RAPKIN GITLIN & BEAUMONT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2012
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2012
  • DocketPURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 01/27/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2009
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2009
  • DocketREQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (TIVOLI COVE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION) A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2008
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY H. JAY FORD TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 08/17/09 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 003 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED /GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2008
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, AND ATTACHMENT "A". FILED. SERVED AS TO (HENG, SEAHQJIWUE) AN INDIVIDUAL AND DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE . COSTS OF $ 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2008
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2008
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2008
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 003 , HON. H. JAY FORD, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. MATTER CONTINUED TO 03/16/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2008
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW FILED BY (TIVOLI COVE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION) A CALIFORNIA NON-PROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2008
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN MAL472300001.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2008
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2008
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2008
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY J.H. FORD TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 11/17/08 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 003 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2008
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 003 OF HONORABLE J.H. FORD .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TIVOLI COVE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICE OF FARID YADEGAR - CHRISTINA C. GASPAR ESQ