Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/11/2016 at 20:33:16 (UTC).

TGA MANAGEMENT & INVESTMENT VS CORTEZ, JANET A

Case Summary

On 10/17/2011 TGA MANAGEMENT INVESTMENT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CORTEZ, JANET A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6253

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TGA MANAGEMENT & INVESTMENT

Defendants

CORTEZ AMIEL BRANDON

CORTEZ JANET A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2011
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS; ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S), AND THE COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6 TO ENFORCE THE FULL TERMS OF SETTLEMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2011
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SERVED AS TO (CORTEZ, AMIEL BRANDON) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2011
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SERVED AS TO (CORTEZ, JANET A) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2011
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) D1 . RECEIPT # 1111017E6982 . 7011 0470 0003 3914 8138

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2011
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (CORTEZ, AMIEL BRANDON) . RECEIPT # 1111017E6982 . 7011 1150 0000 8046 4668

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2011
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN 1111017E6982. HEARING SET FOR 12/07/11 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. NWZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2011
  • FICTITIOUS BUSINESS NAME DECLARATION ELECTRONICALLY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TGA MANAGEMENT INVESTMENT INC. is a litigant