This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/04/2016 at 10:22:13 (UTC).

TERRY, RICHARD VS. YOUNG, DONALD

Case Summary

On 04/05/2006 TERRY, RICHARD filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against YOUNG, DONALD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Malibu Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY ADAMSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0059

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Malibu Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY ADAMSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TERRY RICHARD

Defendant

YOUNG DONALD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF KOONTZ & ASSOCIATES - WILLIAM JAMES KOONTZ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF KOONTZ & ASSOCIATES

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF FRANCINE B. KELLY & ASSOC - SARA YOUNG ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF FRANCINE B. KELLY & ASSOC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2008
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2008
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 07/09/08 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2006
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2006
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. CLK , HON. TERRY ADAMSON PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: THE PARTIES ARE AMENABLE AND THE MATTER IS REFERRED TO MEDIATION. CAUSE IS CONTINUED TO 02-05-07 AT 8:30AM IN DEPT 3 FOR A POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE. CLERK'S OFFICE TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2006
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING ON 02/05/07 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2006
  • NOTICE OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2006
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT (YOUNG, DONALD) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2006
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FOR ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT (YOUNG, DONALD) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2006
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PHONE NUMBER FOR ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT (YOUNG, DONALD) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2006
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (TERRY, RICHARD) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2006
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (YOUNG, DONALD) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2006
  • ANSWER FILED OF (YOUNG, DONALD) . RECEIPT # MAL136401004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT, MANAGEMENT REVIEW, STATEMENT OF DAMAGES, OFFER TO COMPROMISE FILED. SERVED AS TO (YOUNG, DONALD) . COSTS OF $ 85.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2006
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN MAL510618004.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2006
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 08/09/06 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV/DEPT. 003 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 04/05/06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2006
  • CLERK`S NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2006
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less