Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2016 at 09:25:51 (UTC).

TEHRANI, MAZDAK VS. DELACERA, JANA

Case Summary

On 05/21/2009 TEHRANI, MAZDAK filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DELACERA, JANA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD A. STONE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2069

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Beverly Hills Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD A. STONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TEHRANI MAZDAK

Defendant

DELACERA JANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NAZIRI HANASSAB LLP - FRED HANASSAB

Attorney at NAZIRI HANASSAB LLP

Defendant Attorney

SILVA, CLASEN & RAFFALOW - ARA O. SEROPIAN ESQ

Attorney at SILVA, CLASEN & RAFFALOW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 12/21/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2010
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. 006 , HON. ADMINISTRATIVELY HEARD PRESIDING FOR PRE-TRIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2010
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 04/27/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2010
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2010
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO 006 RE: MSC031110

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2010
  • NOTICE OF UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO 006 RE: CMR 09/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (DELACERA, JANA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2009
  • ANSWER RECEIVED AS TO (DELACERA, JANA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2009
  • ANSWER FILED OF (DELACERA, JANA) . RECEIPT # BH490068009 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2009
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY (DELACERA, JANA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2009
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN BH053884018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 006 OF HONORABLE RICHARD A. STONE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2009
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 09/18/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 006 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 05/21/09

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HANASSAB FRED