This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2018 at 05:36:47 (UTC).

TANAEIM, PEJMAN MATTHEW VS. INSURAIDE INSURANCE AGENCY INC

Case Summary

On 05/05/2008 TANAEIM, PEJMAN MATTHEW filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against INSURAIDE INSURANCE AGENCY INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JANE GODFREY, MARC JOSEPH JUIDGE and JOHN T. RAFFERTY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0864

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JANE GODFREY

MARC JOSEPH JUIDGE

JOHN T. RAFFERTY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TANAEIM PEJMAN MATTHEW

Defendants

INSURAIDE INSURANCE AGENCY INC.

MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2011
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 01/21/11 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2008
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO CASEY NELSON FOR MERCURY INSURANCE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 092 , HON. JOHN T. RAFFERTY PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR PLAINTIFF(S). THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2008
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2008
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2008
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO DARYL SANCEEZ FOR MERCURY INS. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. MARC JOSEPH JUIDGE PRO TEM PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 07/07/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 . DEFENDANT WILL NOT STIPULATE TO A JUDGE PRO TEM. CASE IS TRANSFERRED TO DEPARTMENT 90 THE HONORABLE JANE GODFREY PRESIDING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2008
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 , HON. JANE GODFREY PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 08/18/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 . PARTIES AGREE TO CONTINUANCE. DEPARTMENT 90 HAS A VERY HEAVY CALENDAR - CAN'T ACCOMODATE. PROOF OF SERVICE PROPER AS TO BOTH DEFENDANT'S. MATTER CONTINUED TO AUGUST 18, 2008 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2008
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SERVED AS TO (MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY INC.) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 07/07/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2008
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SERVED AS TO (INSURAIDE INSURANCE AGENCY INC.) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 07/07/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2008
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN 1080512E2673. HEARING SET FOR 07/07/08 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. 092.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2008
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FOR SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL ELECTRONICALLY REQUESTED FOR DEFENDANT(S) (MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY INC.) (INSURAIDE INSURANCE AGENCY INC.)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.