This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2018 at 15:22:07 (UTC).

TAN, KENNY VS CARRICO, LOLITA

Case Summary

On 08/27/2008 TAN, KENNY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CARRICO, LOLITA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANTY M PETERS and ANTY PETERS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1111

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ANTY M PETERS

ANTY PETERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAN KENNY

Defendant

CARRICO LOLITA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE ALHAMBRA COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM POM08S01111 TO ALH08SR1111

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO CORR DESK RE: SMALL CLAIMS WORK .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2011
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY WHOLLY UNSATISFIED. COSTS $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:21A M, IN DEPT. 005 , HON. ANTHONY PETERS PRESIDING FOR EXAM. OF JGMT DEBTOR. JGMT CREDITOR APPEARING BY ATTORNEY ANTONY CHEN . JUDGMENT DEBTOR LOLITA CARRICO FAILING TO APPEAR. BENCH WARRANT ORDERED ISSUED BAIL SET AT $7689.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2009
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. 005 , HON. ANTHONY M PETERS PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2008
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 11/03/08 . FOR (TAN, KENNY) . AGAINST (CARRICO, LOLITA) . PRINCIPAL $ 7500.00 . COSTS $ 174.00 . TOTAL $ 7674.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2008
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2008
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2008
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT 005 RE: 11-03-08 CALENDAR .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2008
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO SMALL CLAIM RE: CALENDAR .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2008
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2008
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO SMALL CLAIM DESK RE: INCOMING .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (CARRICO, LOLITA) BY SUB-SERVING JANE DOE;SHIRAM . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 11/03/08 AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. 005 COSTS OF $ 99.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2008
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN POM448028004. HEARING SET FOR 11/03/08 AT 09:00 AM IN DPT. 005.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.