This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2016 at 10:44:40 (UTC).

SYSCO FOOD SERVICES OF LOS ANG VS. L&Y INVESTMENT INC.

Case Summary

On 03/10/2009 SYSCO FOOD SERVICES OF LOS ANG filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against L Y INVESTMENT INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse North located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANTY PETERS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0725

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse North

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANTY PETERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYSCO FOOD SERVICES OF LOS ANGELES INC A SUBSIDIARY OF SYSCO CORP.

Defendants

LEE JAE YOONAKA LEE JAE YUN

L&Y INVESTMENT INC.A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA EAST AVENUE ASIAN BI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPIWAK & IEZZA - LISA E. SPIWAK

Attorney at SPIWAK & IEZZA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 08/02/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2012
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO POMONA COURT NORTH RE: DESTRUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO WEST COVINA COURT HOUSE RE: RELOCATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED IN DEPT. 005 HON. ANTHONY PETERS PRESIDING FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE/REVIEW: CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW HEARING IS TAKEN OFF CALENDAR AND SET FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR 083109, AT 8:30 A.M., IN DEPARTMENT 5, FOR FAILING TO FILE THE PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT. IF THE PROOF OF SERVICE IS FILED PRIOR TO THE NEXT COURT HEARING DATE, THEN NO APPEARANCE SHALL BE REQUIRED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2009
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT 5 RE: 7-29-09 CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2009
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 07/29/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 005 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 03/11/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2009
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN POM448028005.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 005 OF HONORABLE ANTHONY PETERS .

    Read MoreRead Less