This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/16/2016 at 02:37:35 (UTC).

SY, NENITA TEE, VS. VONG, STEVE,

Case Summary

On 01/30/2008 SY, NENITA TEE, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VONG, STEVE,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEANNE SMITH MYERS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2073

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEANNE SMITH MYERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SY NENITA TEE AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

FIRST AMERICAN TEAM INC. AKA FIRST AMERICAN TEAM REALTY

VONG STEVE AN INDIVIDUAL

Cross Defendant

SY NENITA TEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMAS R. LEE - THOMAS R. LEE

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

PARKER, STANBURY - MICHAEL E MCCABE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2013
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • DocketPURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 03/20/13 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2008
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2008
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2008
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2008
  • DocketSTIPULATION RE: SETTLEMENT FILED. RECEIPT # NO FEE .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2008
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY (SY, NENITA TEE,) AN INDIVIDUAL .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2008
  • DocketNEXT ACTION DUE 12/15/08 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. CLK .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2008
  • DocketMEDIATION STATEMENT OF FULL AGREEMENT FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2008
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO FORM AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORI ES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM PLAINTIFF AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1265.00 , DECLARATION, AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED. RECEIPT # FPS . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 09/10/08 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SOG .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2008
  • DocketNOTICE RE: THERE BEING NO OPPOSITIN TO THE COURT'S OSC TO TRANSFER THIS CASE TO LIMITED JURISDICTION, THE CASE IS TRANSFERED TO DEPARTMENT SOG AS LIMITED JURISIDICTION. COUNSEL ARE TO FILE ALL DOCUMENTS UNDER THE LIMITED CASE NUMBER AND FILE IN DEPARTMENT SOG. STATUS CONFERENCE IS SET ON 6/5/08 AT 8:30AM IN DEPARTMENT. NOTICE IS WAIVED. FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2008
  • DocketMATTER SET FOR STATUS CONFERENCE ON 06/05/08 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. SOG .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2008
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2008
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2008
  • Docket1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2008
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2008
  • DocketRECEIVED FEES FROM (VONG, STEVE,) AN INDIVIDUAL , (FIRST AMERICAN TEAM, INC.,) AKA (FIRST AMERICAN TEAM REALTY) IN THE SUM OF $ 680.00 FOR FIRST PAPER FEES . RECEIPT # FPS .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2008
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED. RN LBH472130034.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2008
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2008
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less