Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2016 at 09:10:00 (UTC).

SUMMERS GROUP, INC. VS. BUSTILLOS, EDWARD ROBERT

Case Summary

On 06/10/2009 SUMMERS GROUP, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BUSTILLOS, EDWARD ROBERT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse North located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PAUL BRAU and ANTY PETERS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2057

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse North

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PAUL BRAU

Judge

ANTY PETERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUMMERS GROUP INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION DBA REXEL PACIFIC

Defendant

BUSTILLOS EDWARD ROBERTINDIVIDUALLY AND DBA E B ELECTRIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HEROLD & SAGER - ANDREW D. HEROLD ESQ

Attorney at HEROLD & SAGER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 08/03/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2012
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO POMONA COURT NORTH RE: DESTRUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO WEST COVINA COURT HOUSE RE: RELOCATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED IN DEPT. 005 HON. PAUL BRAU, PRESIDING FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE/REVIEW: CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW HEARING IS TAKEN OFF CALENDAR AND SET FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR 111909, AT 8:30 A.M., IN DEPARTMENT 5, FOR FAILING TO FILE A REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JDUGMENT. IF THE REQUEST IS FILED PRIOR TO THE NEXT COURT HEARING DATE, THEN NO APPEARANCE SHALL BE REQUIRED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2009
  • NOTICE OF HEARING RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE A REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SIGNED AND FILED BY PAUL BRAU, . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 11/19/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 005 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2009
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2009
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (BUSTILLOS, EDWARD ROBERT)INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA (E B ELECTRIC) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO P.O.S. DESK RE: P.O.S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; OSC/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW NOTICE, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT, ADR PACKAGE FILED. SERVED AS TO (BUSTILLOS, EDWARD ROBERT)INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA (E B ELECTRIC) . COSTS OF $ 114.23 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2009
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 10/30/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 005 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 06/12/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2009
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN POM234074007.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 005 OF HONORABLE ANTHONY PETERS .

    Read MoreRead Less