This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/23/2016 at 21:51:36 (UTC).

SU CASA DE CAMBIO, INC. VS. JIMENEZ, ARTEMIO G.

Case Summary

On 02/08/2006 SU CASA DE CAMBIO, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JIMENEZ, ARTEMIO G. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, East Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS N. TOWNSEND. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0224

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THOMAS N. TOWNSEND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SU CASA DE CAMBIO INC.

Defendants

JIMENEZ ARTEMIO AKA JIMENEZ JR. ARTEMIO DBA A

JIMENEZ ARTEMIO G. DBA ART'S TILE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2013
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 01/24/13 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2006
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. RECEIPT # CHECK .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2006
  • NOTICE OF NSF LETTER FROM ACCOUNTING OFFICE RETURNED AS TO (JIMENEZ, ARTEMIO G.) DBA (ART'S TILE) DUE TO UNCLAIM AND RETURN AFTER THREE ATTEMPS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2006
  • NOTICE OF JUDGMENT AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RETURNED AS TO (JIMENEZ, ARTEMIO G.) DBA (ART'S TILE) DUE TO ATTEMPTED-NOT KNOWN .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2006
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. THOMAS N. TOWNSEND PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING IN PRO PER . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR THE PLAINTIFF. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2006
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 06/08/06 . FOR (SU CASA DE CAMBIO, INC.) . AGAINST (JIMENEZ, ARTEMIO) AKA (JIMENEZ, JR., ARTEMIO) DBA (ART'S TILE) . PRINCIPAL $ 852.00 . COSTS $ 85.00 . TOTAL $ 937.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS. GEORGE GARZA APPEARED FOR THE PLAINTIFF. RAFAEL RAMOS TESTIFIED TO SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT -02. THE COURT DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT -01 ON 4-27-06.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2006
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (JIMENEZ, ARTEMIO) AKA (JIMENEZ, JR., ARTEMIO) DBA (ART'S TILE) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2006
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. THOMAS N. TOWNSEND PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE AND TRIAL. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 06/08/06 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 001 . MATTER CONTINUED FOR MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE AND TRIAL CLERK TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2006
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO (JIMENEZ, ARTEMIO G.) DBA (ART'S TILE) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2006
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (JIMENEZ, ARTEMIO) AKA (JIMENEZ, JR., ARTEMIO) DBA (ART'S TILE) BY SUB-SERVING AMY JIMENEZ . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/27/06 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 001 COSTS OF $ 25.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2006
  • AMENDMENT TO CLAIM OF (SU CASA DE CAMBIO, INC.) FILED ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2006
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2006
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. THOMAS N. TOWNSEND PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING, AND DEFENDANT APPEARING BY (MELINA JIMENEZ) DAUGHTER OF DEFENDANT APPEARING ON BEHALF FOR DEFT. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 04/27/06 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 001 . COURT ORDERS MATTER CONTINUE TO 04/27/2006 AT 1:30 P.M. IN CLERK TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2006
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. THOMAS N. TOWNSEND PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING. MELINA JIMENEZ APPEARING ON BEHALF FOR DEFT. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 04/27/06 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 001 . CLERK TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2006
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE/POSTPONEMENT OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING RECEIVED FROM (JIMENEZ, ARTEMIO G.) DBA (ART'S TILE) . CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIV. 001 FOR CONSIDERATION . RECEIPT # ELA135956007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (JIMENEZ, FILIMIO) DBA (ART'S TILE) BY SUB-SERVING MRS. JIMENEZ (WIFE) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 03/21/06 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 001 COSTS OF $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2006
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN ELA288609010. HEARING SET FOR 03/21/06 AT 01:30 PM IN DIV. 001.

    Read MoreRead Less