Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/02/2016 at 21:42:20 (UTC).

STERBCOW, STACY VS SOWER, TIM

Case Summary

On 03/09/2009 STERBCOW, STACY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SOWER, TIM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4200

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STERBCOW STACY

Defendants

SOUER TIM

SOWER TIM

SAUER TIM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2010
  • MOTION RULING ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION FOR AMOUNT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2010
  • MOTION FILED: MOT FOR RECONSIDERATION HEARING SET FOR 4/20/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2010
  • NON-JURY TRIAL CONCLUDED - CAUSE SUBMITTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2010
  • FAILURE TO APPEAR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2010
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2009
  • RETURN CORRESPONDENCE/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/TIM SAUER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2009
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2009
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 03/02/10, 10:00 AM, DEPT 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2009
  • RETURN CORRESPONDENCE/ CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE/ SAUER TIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2009
  • NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2009
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2009
  • OSC SET 06/25/09, 0830 AM, DEPT. 106, NOTICE FILED & MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2009
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2009
  • COMPLAINT FILED - TRANSFER CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2009
  • * * * SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT PREVIOUSLY ISSUED & FILED * * * (LC082732)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2009
  • ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR FEE WAIVER FILED ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2009
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2009
  • TRANSFER/COORDINATION/CONSOLIDATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 09E04200    Hearing Date: October 22, 2020    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE:   Thu., October 22, 2020 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: Sterbcow v. Sower COMPL. FILED: 03-09-09

CASE NUMBER: LAV09E04200 JUDGMENT: 03-02-10

NOTICE:   OK

PROCEEDINGS    MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT

MOVING PARTY:   Plaintiff Stacy Sterbcow, in pro per

RESP. PARTY: None

MOTION TO ENTER RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT

(CCP §§ 1008, 473(b))

TENTATIVE RULING:

To allow the Court additional time to locate the file for this action, Plaintiff Stacy Sterbcow’s Motion for Reconsideration for Renewal of Judgment is CONTINUED TO NOV 18, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

SERVICE

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: None filed as of October 20, 2020 [   ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of October 20, 2020 [   ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background & Discussion

Plaintiff Stacy Sterbcow (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant Motion for Reconsideration for Renewal of Judgment (the “Motion”), in pro per, against Defendant Tim Sower (“Defendant”) on August 11, 2020. Plaintiff states a judgment was entered against Defendant on April 20, 2010 and that she timely filed an Application for Renewal of Judgment (the “Application”) on April 18, 2020. (Mot., Sterbcow Decl., ¶¶ 6, 9.) Before submitting her Application, Plaintiff states she attempted to retrieve the file from the Court twice to verify Defendant’s name but was told the file was “unavailable.” (Id. at ¶ 7.) Plaintiff filed two applications for renewal, both of which were rejected on June 24, 2020 and July 24, 2020.

Due to the age of the file, it is not electronically available for the Court to review. Plaintiff did not submit a copy of the judgment entered in this matter with her moving papers, so the Court is unable to verify the date of entry of judgment, the judgment debtor’s name, or the judgment amount. Thus, the matter is CONTINUED to allow the Court sufficient time to locate and make the file electronically available for the Court’s review.

[Conclusion & Order

To allow the Court additional time to locate the file for this action, Plaintiff Stacy Sterbcow’s Motion for Reconsideration for Renewal of Judgment is CONTINUED TO NOV 18, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.