This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/17/2016 at 17:37:42 (UTC).

STEINKE, GLADYS VS. GUERRERO, JESSE

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 STEINKE, GLADYS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GUERRERO, JESSE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3558

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STEINKE GLADYS

HOAG PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC.

Defendant

GUERRERO JESSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - SUSAN M. THOM

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2010
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2008
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY RETURNED FILED; NO SERVICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2008
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2008
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 09/10/08 , FOR (STEINKE, GLADYS) , AGAINST (GUERRERO, JESSE) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 11717 LAKEWOOD BLVD. #6, DOWNEY, CA 90241 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2008
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 30.83 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2008
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. SIGNAL . RECEIPT # DOW517299019 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2008
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2008
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO (GUERRERO, JESSE) AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2008
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (GUERRERO, JESSE) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN DOW502601007.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.