This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/04/2016 at 10:48:32 (UTC).

STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE F VS. PHILLIPS, WALTER JACKSON

Case Summary

On 10/11/2006 STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE F filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PHILLIPS, WALTER JACKSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Malibu Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAWRENCE J. MIRA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0202

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Malibu Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAWRENCE J. MIRA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND

Defendant

PHILLIPS WALTER JACKSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRIMEN, BJORNSEN & KLEIN - GHISLAINE G. BRASSINE

Attorney at KRIMEN, BJORNSEN & KLEIN

Defendant Attorney

EARLY, MASLACH & VANDUECK - DARRYL T. COLEMAN ESQ

Attorney at EARLY, MASLACH & VANDUECK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2009
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 06/19/09 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2007
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2007
  • NOTICE OF MEDIATION HEARING FILED. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 10/10/07 AT 03:00P M, AT THE FOLLOWING LOCATION: 2682 KENNINGTON DRIVE, GLENDALE, CA 91206 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2007
  • NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF MEDIATOR BY SELECTION OF ADR CLERK OF: LEON J. ALEXANDER ESQ. FILED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MEDIATION MUST BE COMPLETED ON OR BEFORE 10/22/07 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2007
  • ADR CASE REFERRAL INTAKE FORM FILED BY (STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2007
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. 001 , HON. LAWRENCE J. MIRA PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: NON APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: COURT REFERS MATTER TO MEDIATION. CAUSE CONTINUED TO 10-22-07 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPT. 1 FOR A POST MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE. CLERK'S OFFICE TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2007
  • ANSWER FILED OF (PHILLIPS, WALTER JACKSON) . RECEIPT # MAL136401003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2007
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (PHILLIPS, WALTER JACKSON) BY PRODOC LA AT COUNTER FOR REJECTION OF ANSWER AND CHECK NO 235275 FOR $300.00 BECAUSE THE FIRST APPEARANCE FEE IS $180.00. SUBMITTED ON 03/05/07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2007
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) PACKAGE, AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW FILED. SERVED AS TO (PHILLIPS, WALTER JACKSON) . COSTS OF $ 122.95 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2007
  • FIRST AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2007
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2006
  • NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2006
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN MAL510618058.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2006
  • CLERK`S NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2006
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 02/14/07 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV/DEPT. 001 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 10/11/06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2006
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.