This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2016 at 11:07:10 (UTC).

STABLE ENTERPRISES, LLC VS. BALTAZAR, ANABEL

Case Summary

On 04/03/2009 STABLE ENTERPRISES, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BALTAZAR, ANABEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, El Monte Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HOWARD RUBIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0311

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    El Monte Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HOWARD RUBIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STABLE ENTERPRISES LLC

Defendants

BALTAZAR ANABEL

BALTAZAR JULIO CESAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIDDLE & LIDDLE A PROFESSIONAL CORP. - LAYNE L. LIDDLE

Attorney at LIDDLE & LIDDLE A PROFESSIONAL CORP.

Defendant Attorney

A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION - PETER A. NELSON

Attorney at A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 103.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. MAILED NO LOCK OUT PRIOR TO 7-1-09 . RECEIPT # ELM236112020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2009
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 46.66 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2009
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 , HON. HOWARD RUBIN PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING STABLE ENTERPRISES, LLC . DEFENDANT(S) FAILING TO APPEAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2009
  • JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2009
  • JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION ORDERED ENTERED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2009
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 05/11/09 . FOR (STABLE ENTERPRISES, LLC), . AGAINST (BALTAZAR, ANABEL) , (BALTAZAR, JULIO CESAR) . FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 12333 ELLIOTT AVENUE (HOUSE), EL MONTE, CA 91732 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (BALTAZAR, ANABEL) . COSTS OF $ 35.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMLPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (BALTAZAR, JULIO CESAR) . COSTS OF $ 35.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO ALL TENANTS, SUBTENANTS, NAMED CLAIMANTS AND OTHER OCCUPANTS . COSTS OF $ 35.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2009
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2009
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2009
  • ANSWER FILED OF (BALTAZAR, ANABEL) , (BALTAZAR, JULIO CESAR) . RECEIPT # ELM235338024 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2009
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN ELM236112012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less