This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2016 at 04:22:24 (UTC).

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COM VS. ZETINA, FEDERICO

Case Summary

On 01/29/2009 SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COM filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ZETINA, FEDERICO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, El Monte Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LYNN D. OLSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0244

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    El Monte Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LYNN D. OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY A CORPORATION

Defendant

ZETINA FEDERICO AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - DAVID R. GARCIA

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Defendant Attorney

RIOS & ASSOCIATES - RALPH M. RIOS

Attorney at RIOS & ASSOCIATES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2010
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY) A CORPORATION FOR REJECTION OF COURT JUDGMENT- PLEASE BE ADVISED, THIS MATTER WAS DISMISSED ON 12-01-09. THANK YOU SUBMITTED ON 10/21/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2009
  • MEDIATION STATEMENT OF FULL AGREEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2009
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2009
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT RE: UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY (SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY) A CORPORATION .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2009
  • NEXT ACTION DUE 12/18/09 AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. 001 . POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2009
  • NOTICE OF MEDIATION HEARING FILED. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 10/14/09 AT 09:00A M, AT THE FOLLOWING LOCATION: 2682 KENNINGTON DRIVE, GLENDALE, CA 91206 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2009
  • NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF MEDIATOR BY SELECTION OF ADR CLERK OF: LEON J. ALEXANDER ESQ. FILED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MEDIATION MUST BE COMPLETED ON OR BEFORE 11/20/09 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2009
  • NEXT ACTION DUE 11/20/09 AT 10:00A M, IN DEPT. MED . MEDIATION COMPLETION DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY) A CORPORATION .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2009
  • RECEIVED FEES FROM RALPH M. RIOS ESQ. IN THE SUM OF $ 200.00 FOR ANSWER VIA FAX FILING . RECEIPT # ELM478900009 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2009
  • ANSWER FILED OF (ZETINA, FEDERICO) . RECEIPT # PAID .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2009
  • RECEIVED FEES FROM RALPH M RIOS, ESQ. / COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT IN THE SUM OF $ 3.50 FOR ANSWER VIA FAX FILING . RECEIPT # ELM478900005 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT,ADR PKG,COMP.FOR PROP.DAMAGE,CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET & ADDEND.,STMT OF LOC.,NOT. OF CASE ASSGNMNT FILED. SERVED AS TO (ZETINA, FEDERICO) AN INDIVIDUAL . COSTS OF $ 53.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2009
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN ELM482668019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 001 OF HONORABLE LYNN D. OLSON .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2009
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 06/18/09 AT 09:30A M, IN DEPT. 001 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 01/29/09

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.