This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/22/2016 at 05:54:19 (UTC).

SOUTH BAY CONTRACTORS VS. KING, TAMARA

Case Summary

On 05/26/2009 SOUTH BAY CONTRACTORS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against KING, TAMARA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROSE HOM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1049

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROSE HOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOUTH BAY CONTRACTORS

Defendant

KING TAMARA DBA EXECUTIVE KUTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GALLAGHER & MOORE - FREDERICK C. MOORE ESQ

Attorney at GALLAGHER & MOORE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2014
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • DocketPURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 06/10/14 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2013
  • Docket* EFFECTIVE 05/20/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2013
  • Docket* CASE REASSIGNED TO THE LONG BEACH COURTHOUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2013
  • Docket* CASE RENUMBERED FROM COM09Q01049 TO LB 09Q01049

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2009
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 03:30P M, IN DEPT. 00A , HON. ROSE HOM PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: COURT ORDER . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: SEE BODY OF MINUTE ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2009
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 03:00P M, IN DEPT. 00A , HON. ROSE HOM PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: SEE BODY OF MINUTE ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2009
  • DocketCOURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ENFORCE AND AMEND JUDGMENT HAVING BEEN DENIED ON 12-15-09 AND PURSUANT TO THE ORIGINAL TERMS OF THE STIPULATED AGREEMENT, THE COURT DISMISSES THE CASE WITH PREJUDICE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2009
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 10:30A M, IN DEPT. OOA , HON. ROSE HOM PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: COMPLIANCE HEARING CONTINUED . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY DEFENDANT. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE WITNESSES IS GRANTED AND WITNESSES ARE ORDERED EXCLUDED FROM THE COURTROOM. JONTE KING AND MARSHAWN EDWARDS ARE GIVEN OATH AND TESTIFY FOR THE DEFENDANT. TAMARA KING IS GIVEN OATH AND TESTIFIES ON HER OWN BEHALF. DEFENDANT RESTS. PLAINTIFF SUBMITS DOCUMENTS FOR THE COURT'S REVIEW SUCH AS DECLARATIONS AND SUCH. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL AND DEFENDANT MAKE CLOSING ARGUMENTS. THE COURT TAKES THE MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION. DEFENDANT IS TO STAY AWAY FROM THE PREMISES.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2009
  • DocketCOURT TAKES MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2009
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • DocketUD TRIALS ET FOR 07/07/09 DPT.8 9:30A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2009
  • DocketREQUEST TO SET CASE FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2009
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (KING, TAMARA) DBA (EXECUTIVE KUTS) . COSTS OF $ 52.90

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2009
  • DocketANSWER REC'VD BY TAMARA KING DBA EXECUTIVE CUTS CG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2009
  • DocketANSWER FILED OF (KING, TAMARA) DBA (EXECUTIVE KUTS) . RECEIPT # PAID .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2009
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2009
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN 540179031.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less