This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2021 at 14:52:26 (UTC).

SOTER, NETTIE VS BOND FAMILY INC.

Case Summary

On 04/27/2010 SOTER, NETTIE filed an Other lawsuit against BOND FAMILY INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3452

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

SOTER NETTIE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BOND FAMILY INC.

WESTERN SURETY COMPANY

Cross Defendants

WALCHENBACH PAULUS

SOTER NETTIE

MOZUR INC.

MOZUR BRIAN

AMERICAN CONTRACTOR'S INDEMNITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOTER, GARY S.

Defendant Attorney

CHANEY III, ALBERT LON

Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

STROJ, ROBERT J

CHANEY, ALBERT LON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2014
  • Docket*******CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVT. CODE SECTION 68151 - 68153**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2012
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 07/12/12, 10:00 AM, DEPT 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • DocketA/C ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDEF FILED BY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2012
  • DocketOSC SET 04/27/12, 0830 AM, DEPT. 106, NOTICE FILED & MAILED * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • DocketSUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
87 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2010
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - 1) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RECLASSIFICATION TO THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2010
  • DocketMOTION FILED: MOTION TO COMPEL INTERROG HEARING SET FOR 7/19/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2010
  • DocketMOTION FILED: MOTION TO COMPEL INTERROG HEARING SET FOR 7/19/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2010
  • DocketMOTION FILED: FOR DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT HEARING SET FOR 7/19/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2010
  • DocketMOTION FILED: FOR DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT HEARING SET FOR 7/19/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2010
  • DocketA/C - MOTION FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2010
  • DocketA/C - MOTION FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2010
  • DocketA/C - MOTION FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2010
  • DocketTRANSFER/COORDINATION/CONSOLIDATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOZUR INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BOND FAMILY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Western Surety Company is a litigant

Latest cases where American Contractors Indemnity Company is a litigant