This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/22/2018 at 21:18:02 (UTC).

SONG, JANET VS OAK ESCROW, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/20/2010 SONG, JANET filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against OAK ESCROW, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM V. MCTAGGART and JOHN P. DOYLE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1099

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM V. MCTAGGART

JOHN P. DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SONG JANET

Defendant

OAK ESCROW INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE ALHAMBRA COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM GLN10S01099 TO ALH10SG1099

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2010
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2010
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL DE NOVO ON APPEAL MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2010
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (OAK ESCROW, INC.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 02:00P M, IN DEPT. 003 , HON. JOHN P. DOYLE PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO. APPELLANT APPEARING IN PRO PER BY JENNIFER WOODARD . RESPONDENT APPEARING. IN PRO PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2010
  • AFTER SUBMISSION, COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2010
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION AFTER APPEAL AND TRIAL DE NOVO ON 09/13/10 . FOR (SONG, JANET) . AGAINST (OAK ESCROW, INC.) . PRINCIPAL $ 5000.00 , COSTS $ 80.00 , ATTORNEY FEES $ .00 , AND SUPERIOR COURT COSTS $ .00 . TOTAL $ 5080.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2010
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY (OAK ESCROW, INC.) . RECEIPT # GLN525019025 . MATTER SET FOR HEARING RE: SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO ON 09/13/10 AT 02:00P M, IN DEPT. 003 OF THE GLENDALE SUPERIOR COURT . CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF APPEAL AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 005 , HON. WILLIAM V. MCTAGGART, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING JANET SONG . DEFENDANT APPEARING BY JENNIFER WOODARD .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2010
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2010
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 07/20/10 . FOR (SONG, JANET) . AGAINST (OAK ESCROW, INC.) . PRINCIPAL $ 5000.00 . COSTS $ 80.00 . TOTAL $ 5080.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS. RELEASE OF TRUST FUNDS FROM ESCROW 45619.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2010
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED BY SHERIFF. SERVED AS TO (OAK ESCROW, INC.) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 07/20/10 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 005 . COSTS OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2010
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN GLN525019001. HEARING SET FOR 07/20/10 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. 005.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OAK ESCROW INC. A BUSINESS ORGANIZATION is a litigant