This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2016 at 16:28:30 (UTC).

SHEPARD INVESTMENTS, INC. VS. STEWART, JEANNE

Case Summary

On 09/03/2009 SHEPARD INVESTMENTS, INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against STEWART, JEANNE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, El Monte Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0875

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHEPARD INVESTMENTS INC.

Defendant

STEWART JEANNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN - JESSICA S. WEISMAN

Attorney at KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2010
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 103.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. R & R ATTORNEY SERVICE . RECEIPT # ELM511049007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2009
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 50.00 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT, UNLAWFUL DETAINER/PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO (STEWART, JEANNE) . COSTS OF $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT, UNLAWFUL DETAINER/PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS . COSTS OF $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2009
  • APPLICATION FOR CLERK TO ENTER JUDGMENT FOR IMMEDIATE RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2009
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (STEWART, JEANNE) , ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2009
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2009
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2009
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 10/05/09 , FOR (SHEPARD INVESTMENTS, INC.) , AGAINST (STEWART, JEANNE) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 1412 DELTA AVENUE, ROSEMEAD, CA 91770 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2009
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2009
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (STEWART, JEANNE) , ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2009
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (SHEPARD INVESTMENTS, INC.) FOR REJECTION OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT/CLERK'S JUDGMENT- THE PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO JEANNE STEWART, THE PLAINTIFF PARTY MUST BE INDICATED. SECONDLY, THE PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS, MUST BE SIGNED. SUBMITTED ON 09/24/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2009
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN ELM511049010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHEPPARD INVESTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEISMAN, JESSICA S