This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/01/2016 at 17:14:03 (UTC).

SHARMOUR ENTERPRISES INC VS BEGINYAN'S INC

Case Summary

On 05/20/2008 SHARMOUR ENTERPRISES INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BEGINYAN'S INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6007

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHARMOUR ENTERPRISES INC

Defendant

BEGINYAN'S INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RODMAN, KENNETH BRIAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2011
  • ** CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERMNENT CODE SECTION 68151-68153

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HELD, MINUTE ORDER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2009
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL BY COURT'S MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND ORDER - PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2008
  • OSC CONTINUED TO 02/11/09 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2008
  • OSC SET 12/16/08, 0830 AM, DEPT. 106, NOTICE FILED & MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2008
  • A/C - COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2008
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2008
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2008
  • NON-APP CASE MGMT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 10/28/08, IN DEPT NWA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2008
  • CMR CLERK'S CERT OF SERVICE GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RODMAN KENNETH BRIAN