Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/02/2016 at 18:48:46 (UTC).

SHAPIRO, LEONARD VS. IWAMIZU, KALUNDA

Case Summary

On 12/23/2010 SHAPIRO, LEONARD filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against IWAMIZU, KALUNDA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LESLIE E. BROWN and BOBBI TILLMON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1143

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LESLIE E. BROWN

BOBBI TILLMON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHAPIRO LEONARD

Defendant

IWAMIZU KALUNDA AKA IWAMIZU RAE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE SANTA MONICA COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM BH 10U01143 TO SM 10UB1143

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2011
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION RE: EX PARTE FILED. FILE SENT TO DEPT. 005 . RECEIPT # FEE WAIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2011
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:30A M, IN DEPT. 006 , HON. JUDGE LESLIE E. BROWN PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER REGARDING RECLAIMING ABONDONED PROPERTY; . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER REGARDING RECLAIMING ABONDONED PROPERTY IS HEARD. ORAL AGREEMENT REACHED. DEFENDANT TENDERED $500.00 CASH TO PLAINTIFF AND AGREE TO MEET AT PUBLIC STORAGE ON BEVERLY BLVD IN LOS ANGELES AT 11:30AM TODAY REGARDING RELEASING PROPERTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2011
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE RE: PREVENTING FURTHER VEXING AND HARASSMENT RECEIVED FROM LEONARD SHAPIRO AND PLACED INTO THE CASE FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 125.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2011
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED FOR PLAINTIFF (SHAPIRO, LEONARD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # 458341009 .

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2011
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF ***************************** , AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP, DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP , MEMO OF COSTS, IN THE SUM OF $ 305.00 , AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2011
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FOR DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46 ON 01/14/11 FILED. DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 305.00 , AND DECLARATON OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2011
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (IWAMIZU, KALUNDA) AKA (IWAMIZU, RAE) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2011
  • ANSWER FILED OF (IWAMIZU, KALUNDA) AKA (IWAMIZU, RAE) . RECEIPT # FEE WAIVER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2011
  • ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED AS TO (IWAMIZU, KALUNDA) AKA (IWAMIZU, RAE) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2010
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN BH458341023.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2010
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2010
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2010
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2010
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 006 OF HONORABLE LESLIE E. BROWN .

    Read MoreRead Less