This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2016 at 10:24:26 (UTC).

SECURITY CREDIT SERVICES VS. LOPES, ROSA M

Case Summary

On 03/06/2009 SECURITY CREDIT SERVICES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LOPES, ROSA M. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse North located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANTY PETERS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0700

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse North

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANTY PETERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SECURITY CREDIT SERVICES LLC

Defendant

LOPES ROSA M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF RORY W. CLARK - RORY W. CLARK

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF RORY W. CLARK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2012
  • CASE FILE RECEIVED FROM THE POMONA NORTH COURTHOUSE AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 08/01/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO WEST COVINA COURT HOUSE RE: RELOCATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2010
  • DISCHARGE OF DEBTOR FILED FROM U.S. BANKRUPTCY COURT AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION. U.S. BANKRUPTCY COURT ORDERS THAT THE DEFENDANT{S} NAMED HEREIN IS RELIEVED FROM ALL DISCHARGABLE DEBTS; ANY JUDGMENT OBTAINED HEREIN OR HEREAFTER IS NULL AND VOID.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO CORR DESK RE: MISC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2009
  • DISCHARGE OF DEBTOR FILED FROM U.S. BANKRUPTCY COURT AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION. U.S. BANKRUPTCY COURT ORDERS THAT THE DEFENDANT{S} NAMED HEREIN IS RELIEVED FROM ALL DISCHARGABLE DEBTS; ANY JUDGMENT OBTAINED HEREIN OR HEREAFTER IS NULL AND VOID.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2009
  • AUTOMATIC STAY OF EXECUTION FOR BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDING FILED BEFORE JUDGMENT AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO P.O.S. DESK RE: PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; OSC/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW NOTICE, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT, ADR PACKAGE FILED. SERVED AS TO (LOPES, ROSA M) . COSTS OF $ 150.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2009
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN POM448028015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 005 OF HONORABLE ANTHONY PETERS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY ANTHONY PETERS TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 09/09/09 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 005 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less