This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/03/2019 at 10:21:27 (UTC).

SBB ROOFING INC VS ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES

Case Summary

On 02/26/2009 SBB ROOFING INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3688

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SBB ROOFING INC

SBB ROOFING INC DBA BILT-WELL ROOF & MATERIAL CO

Defendants

RIBET EDUCATION FUND INC

ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES

RIBET EDUCATION FUND INC DBA RIBET ACADEMY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF RAYMOND H AVER

Defendant Attorneys

DAUZAT, RONALD R

DAUZAT RONALD R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2010
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2010
  • Judgment ordered this date and entry of judgment recorded separately.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2010
  • Plaintiff(s) Defendant(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2010
  • RIBET EDUCATION FUND INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2010
  • Witness(es) sworn for defendant(s):SHARON LEMON AND ANGELA WRIGHT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2010
  • 09K03688

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2010
  • Plaintiffs SBB ROOFING INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2010
  • P6(INVOICE),P7(FAX COVER SHEET TO INVOICE),P8(COLLECTIONS LETTER) AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2010
  • CI43-MINS CIVIL MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2010
  • SBB ROOFING INC VS. ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2009
  • CASE REFERRED TO MEDIATION - BY COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2009
  • DEPARTMENT 77 HAS BEEN DESIGNATED THE MASTER CALENDAR COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2009
  • ALL FUTURE HEARING DATES ARE NOW SET IN DEPARTMENT 77.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2009
  • RESPONSE FILED - ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2009
  • NON-APP CASE MGMT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 07/30/09, IN DEPT 75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2009
  • CMR CLERK'S CERT OF SERVICE MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2009
  • COMPLAINT FILED Filing Fee: 200.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RIBET EDUCATION FUND INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SBB ROOFING INC. AKA BILT WELL ROOF AND MATERIAL CO A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES THE is a litigant