Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/18/2016 at 04:33:57 (UTC).

SARKISYAN, NORIK VS. MOON, JODY

Case Summary

On 08/28/2009 SARKISYAN, NORIK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MOON, JODY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARK LUEVANO and CAROL J. HALLOWITZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1638

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Beverly Hills Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARK LUEVANO

CAROL J. HALLOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BEVERLY HILLS TRANSIT INC. REGISTERED OWNER

SARKISYAN NORIK DRIVER

Defendant

MOON JODY DRIVER & REGISTERED OWNER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 04/30/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2010
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RETURNED AS TO (MOON, JODY) DRIVER & REGISTERED OWNER DUE TO RETURNED TO SENDER NOT DELIVERABLE UNABLE TO FORWARD .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2010
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 004 , HON. MARK LUEVANO, JUDGE PROTEM PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2010
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT 004. RE: SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/18/10 AT 1:30 P.M. IN DEPARTMENT 004. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2009
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: MINUTE ORDER RETURNED AS TO (MOON, JODY) DRIVER & REGISTERED OWNER DUE TO UNABLE TO FORWARD .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 004 , HON. CAROL J. HALLOWITZ, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 03/18/10 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 004 . MATTER CONTINUED PER STIPULATION OF ALL PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2009
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT. 004 RE: SMALL CLAIMS MATTER SCHEDULED FOR 12/17/09 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (BLAINE, JODY) DRIVER & REGISTERED OWNER BY SUB-SERVING LOIA SYLCOATT, CO-OCCUPANT . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 12/17/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 004 COSTS OF $ 158.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT. 004 RE: SMALL CLAIMS MATTER SCHEDULED FOR 11/13/09 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2009
  • PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT (BEFORE SERVICE) FILED , 1ST REQUEST (SELF ADDRESSED STAMPED ENVELOPE PROVIDED) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2009
  • MATTER RE-SCHEDULED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 12/17/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2009
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # BH458341006 . HEARING SET FOR 11/13/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 004

    Read MoreRead Less