Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/11/2016 at 20:20:14 (UTC).

SARGSYAN, SARIBEK VS. CRUZ, ERNESTO LEON

Case Summary

On 10/28/2011 SARGSYAN, SARIBEK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CRUZ, ERNESTO LEON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MINA D. FRIED. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6084

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MINA D. FRIED

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SARGSYAN SARIBEK

Defendants

RIVAS JOSE JIMENEZ

CRUZ ERNESTO LEON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2013
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2012
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWZ , HON. MINA D. FRIED PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT (BEFORE SERVICE) FILED /P1 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2011
  • RECEIVED BY FAX SC-150 REQUEST TO POSTPONE RECEIVED AS TO (SARGSYAN, SARIBEK) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2011
  • PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT (BEFORE SERVICE) FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2011
  • MATTER RE-SCHEDULED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 02/02/12 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWZ .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2011
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (SARGSYAN, SARIBEK) FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL (NO FILING FEE) SUBMITTED ON 12/07/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # LAV114541004 . HEARING SET FOR 12/15/11 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWZ

    Read MoreRead Less