Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2016 at 08:16:31 (UTC).

SAND CANYON GATEWAY, L.L.C. VS. GRANADOS, DARIO

Case Summary

On 03/17/2006 SAND CANYON GATEWAY, L L C filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GRANADOS, DARIO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Clarita Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0244

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Clarita Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAND CANYON GATEWAY L.L.C.

Defendant

GRANADOS DARIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JERRY H. VOSEN, ATTORNEY AT LAW - JERRY H. VOSEN ESQ

Attorney at JERRY H. VOSEN, ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2008
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2006
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2006
  • NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY (SAND CANYON GATEWAY, L.L.C.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2006
  • RECEIVED FEES FROM (SAND CANYON GATEWAY, L.L.C.) IN THE SUM OF $ 6.00 FOR FAX FILING FEES FOR NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE . RECEIPT # NEW240853007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2006
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF ALL OCCUPANTS . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2006
  • DECLARATION RE: OF MAILING FILED 04/06/06 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (GRANADOS, DARIO) , ALL OCCUPANTS . COSTS OF $ 150.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2006
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (GRANADOS, DARIO) , NO DEFAULT FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2006
  • ANSWER FILED OF (GRANADOS, DARIO) . RECEIPT # NEW240853009 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2006
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2006
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN NEW477728002.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2006
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2006
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 05/19/06 AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 004 . OSC RE DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VOSEN JERRY H. ESQ.