This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2016 at 17:51:31 (UTC).

SANCHEZ, ROBERTO VS. LOPEZ, ENRIQUE

Case Summary

On 04/21/2009 SANCHEZ, ROBERTO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LOPEZ, ENRIQUE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Huntington Park Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAIME R. CORRAL. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1273

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Huntington Park Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JAIME R. CORRAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SANCHEZ ROBERTO

SANCHEZ ROSITA

Defendants

LOPEZ ENRIQUE

VALENZUELA MARIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2010
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2010
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 09/23/10 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 002 , HON. JAIME R. CORRAL PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING ENRIQUE LOPEZ . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR PLAINTIFF(S). THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2009
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2009
  • AFTER SUBMISSION, COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: THE COURT ORDERS THAT ALL PARTIES, PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT, RETURN TO COURT ON JUNE 18, 2009 AT 1:30 P.M. IN DEPARTENT . 2 WITH ALL SUPPORTING EVIDENCE FOR FURTHER HEARING ON THE MATTER OF ROBERTO SANCHEZ VS. ENRIQUE LOPEZ. CLERK TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2009
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): FOR FURTHER SMALL CLAIMS HEARING , ON 06/18/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 002 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2009
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 002 , HON. JAIME R. CORRAL PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2009
  • COURT TAKES MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED BY SHERIFF. SERVED AS TO (LOPEZ, ENRIQUE) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 06/03/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 002 . COSTS OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED BY SHERIFF. SERVED AS TO (VALENZUELA, MARIA) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 06/03/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 002 . COSTS OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2009
  • AMENDMENT TO CLAIM OF (SANCHEZ, ROBERTO) , (SANCHEZ, ROSITA) FILED AMENDING DEFENDANT 2, LAST NAME ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED BY SHERIFF. SERVED AS TO (LOPEZ, ENRIQUE) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 06/03/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 002 . COSTS OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2009
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN HPK542830001. HEARING SET FOR 06/03/09 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. 002.

    Read MoreRead Less