This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/13/2016 at 05:42:22 (UTC).

SAM S. DJANG VS ABE'S GARAGE DOORS & GATES, IN

Case Summary

On 03/24/2011 SAM S DJANG filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ABE'S GARAGE DOORS GATES, IN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARTIN GREEN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0724

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARTIN GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAM S. DJANG

Defendant

ABE'S GARAGE DOORS & GATES INC C/O WILLIAM MAHANIAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2014
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO VAN NUYS RE: FILE ROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE VAN NUYS COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM CHA11W00724 TO LAV11W00724

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2011
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2011
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2011
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 04/28/11 . THE COURT ORDERS THAT THE DEFENDANT(S) DOES NOT OWE PLAINTIFF(S) ANY MONEY ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2011
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (ABE'S GARAGE DOORS & GATES, INC) C/O WILLIAM MAHANIAN .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2011
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. F43 , HON. MARTIN GREEN PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING IN PRO PER . DEFENDANT APPEARING IN PRO PER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2011
  • REQUEST FOR ACCOMMODATIONS BY PERSONS WITH DISABILITIES & RESPONSE FILED BY PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AS TO (ABE'S GARAGE DOORS & GATES, INC) C/O WILLIAM MAHANIAN FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/28/11 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPARTMENT F43 . SERVICE COSTS: $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2011
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN CHA511599001. HEARING SET FOR 04/28/11 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. F43.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABE`S GARAGE DOORS & GATES INC. is a litigant