This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2016 at 06:47:37 (UTC).

ROTO VS. YEN, KUN

Case Summary

On 08/06/2009 ROTO filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against YEN, KUN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RALPH C. HOFER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1416

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RALPH C. HOFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROTO LLC

Defendant

YEN KUN DBA TB AUTO SERVICE AND REPAIR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF CHING C. LIM - CHING C. LIM ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF CHING C. LIM

Defendant Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - ALBERT ROBLES

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2016
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 04/21/16 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE PASADENA COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM CIT09U01416 TO PAS09UJ1416

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2009
  • COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THE COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6 TO ENFORCE THE FULL TERMS OF THE SETTLEMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2009
  • CLERK`S NOTICE OF DISMISSAL PER 664.6 CCP FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 002 , HON. RALPH C. HOFER PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: MOTION TO FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS MATTER PLACE OFF CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2009
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO 12/15/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2009
  • REPLY RE: IN SUPPORT OF ITS SEPERATE MOTIN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY (ROTO) LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2009
  • ROTO, LLC`S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF IT`S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2009
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF HEARING RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE ANY AND ALL PAPERS/DOCUMENTS NECESSARY TO BRING THE MATTER TO TRIAL OR TO EFFECT A FINAL DISPOSITION AS TO ALL ISSUES AND PARTIES TO THE ACTION. ORDER SIGNED AND FILED BY HAROLD J. MULVILLE . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 10/28/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (YEN, KUN) DBA (TB AUTO SERVICE AND REPAIR) . COSTS OF $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2009
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (ROTO) LLC FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/CLERK`S JUDGMENT REASON: AN ANSWER HAS BEEN FILED BY DEFENDANT ON 8/14/09. SUBMITTED ON 08/20/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2009
  • ANSWER FILED OF (YEN, KUN) DBA (TB AUTO SERVICE AND REPAIR) . RECEIPT # CIT446486010 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2009
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2009
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN PAID.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Roto-Mix, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALBERT ROBLES