This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/29/2016 at 11:31:50 (UTC).

ROLANDO, GREGORY VS. CRAZY HORSE RESTAURANT AND NIG

Case Summary

On 10/18/2010 ROLANDO, GREGORY filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CRAZY HORSE RESTAURANT AND NIG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HAROLD J. MULVILLE and DOUG SORTINO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5746

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    West Covina Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HAROLD J. MULVILLE

DOUG SORTINO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROLANDO GREGORY AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendant

CRAZY HORSE RESTAURANT AND NIGHTCLUB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DERRICK R. STURM P.C. - DERRICK R. STURM ESQ

Attorney at DERRICK R. STURM P.C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 07/09/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 , HON. DOUG SORTINO PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CLERK`S NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2011
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE/REVIEW MINUTE ORDER MAILED/GIVEN TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2011
  • CAUSE CALLED IN DEPT. 002 HON. COMMISSIONER HAROLD J. MULVILLE PRESIDING FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE/REVIEW: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE DISMISSAL OR 585 PACKAGE TO BE SUBMITTED BY 05/04/11 AT 8:30 A.M., DEPT 2, AS TO ALL NON-ANSWERING DEFENDANTS. NO APPEARANCE REQUIRED IF JUDGMENT TENDERED. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT SET FOR 06/20/11, 8:30 A.M., DEPT 2. IF FOR ANY REASON JUDGMENT IS NOT ENTERED, CASE WILL BE DISMISSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2011
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 05/04/11 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 . 585 DEFAULT PACKAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2011
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 06/20/11 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 . ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (CRAZY HORSE RESTAURANT AND NIGHTCLUB) BUSINESS SERVED ALLISON SYPES, MANAGER . COSTS OF $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY MAIL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE HAVING BEEN FILED, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE DATE OF 12/27/10 IS VACATED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2010
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 03/21/11 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 002 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 10/20/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2010
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN PAID.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2010
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 12/27/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 . PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CRAZY HORSE RESTAURANT AND NIGTCLUB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STURM, DERRICK R